|
10/04/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 480, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2677.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2197.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 966.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|