California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB863 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2015

Amended

Bill July 8, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015