California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB866 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Amended

Bill June 8, 2016
Bill May 12, 2016
Bill March 30, 2016
Bill May 28, 2015
Bill April 13, 2015