LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB866
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB866
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB866
Compare Versions
AB866 Amended June 8, 2016
AB866 Amended May 12, 2016
AB866 Amended March 30, 2016
AB866 Amended May 28, 2015
AB866 Amended April 13, 2015
AB866 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB866 Amended June 8, 2016
AB866 Amended May 12, 2016
AB866 Amended March 30, 2016
AB866 Amended May 28, 2015
AB866 Amended April 13, 2015
AB866 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare