California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB873 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill May 25, 2016
Bill April 20, 2016
Bill April 13, 2015