LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB873
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB873
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB873
Compare Versions
AB873 Chaptered September 30, 2016
AB873 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB873 Amended August 19, 2016
AB873 Amended May 25, 2016
AB873 Amended April 20, 2016
AB873 Amended April 13, 2015
AB873 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB873 Chaptered September 30, 2016
AB873 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB873 Amended August 19, 2016
AB873 Amended May 25, 2016
AB873 Amended April 20, 2016
AB873 Amended April 13, 2015
AB873 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare