California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB874 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill June 13, 2016
Bill February 17, 2016
Bill March 26, 2015