LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB874
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB874
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB874
Compare Versions
AB874 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB874 Amended August 15, 2016
AB874 Amended June 30, 2016
AB874 Amended June 13, 2016
AB874 Amended February 17, 2016
AB874 Amended March 26, 2015
AB874 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB874 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB874 Amended August 15, 2016
AB874 Amended June 30, 2016
AB874 Amended June 13, 2016
AB874 Amended February 17, 2016
AB874 Amended March 26, 2015
AB874 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare