|
10/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 593, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 14. Page 2147.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 26. Page 1871.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|