California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB876 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2015

Amended

Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015