California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB88 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2015

Amended

Bill July 15, 2015
Bill June 30, 2015
Bill May 20, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015