LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB88
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB88
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB88
Compare Versions
AB88 Enrolled September 4, 2015
AB88 Amended July 15, 2015
AB88 Amended June 30, 2015
AB88 Amended May 20, 2015
AB88 Amended April 6, 2015
AB88 Introduced January 7, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB88 Enrolled September 4, 2015
AB88 Amended July 15, 2015
AB88 Amended June 30, 2015
AB88 Amended May 20, 2015
AB88 Amended April 6, 2015
AB88 Introduced January 7, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare