California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB885 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 17, 2016
Bill June 2, 2016
Bill May 12, 2016
Bill January 21, 2016