LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB885
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB885
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB885
Compare Versions
AB885 Enrolled August 29, 2016
AB885 Amended August 17, 2016
AB885 Amended June 2, 2016
AB885 Amended May 12, 2016
AB885 Amended January 21, 2016
AB885 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB885 Enrolled August 29, 2016
AB885 Amended August 17, 2016
AB885 Amended June 2, 2016
AB885 Amended May 12, 2016
AB885 Amended January 21, 2016
AB885 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare