|
10/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 594, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 12. Page 2958.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Senate Rule 29.3 (a) suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2506.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2507.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 16. Page 2483.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Hueso. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2483.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 1546.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|