California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB888 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2015

Amended

Bill September 3, 2015
Bill September 1, 2015
Bill April 22, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015