California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB908 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill March 4, 2016

Chaptered

Bill April 11, 2016

Amended

Bill February 24, 2016
Bill September 4, 2015
Bill August 31, 2015
Bill June 18, 2015
Bill March 18, 2015