LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB908
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB908
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB908
Compare Versions
AB908 Chaptered April 11, 2016
AB908 Enrolled March 4, 2016
AB908 Amended February 24, 2016
AB908 Amended September 4, 2015
AB908 Amended August 31, 2015
AB908 Amended June 18, 2015
AB908 Amended March 18, 2015
AB908 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB908 Chaptered April 11, 2016
AB908 Enrolled March 4, 2016
AB908 Amended February 24, 2016
AB908 Amended September 4, 2015
AB908 Amended August 31, 2015
AB908 Amended June 18, 2015
AB908 Amended March 18, 2015
AB908 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare