|
08/25/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 178, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5807.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Ordered to the unfinished business file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4724.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1811.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|