California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB920 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 25, 2016

Amended

Bill September 3, 2015
Bill September 1, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015
Bill April 23, 2015
Bill April 8, 2015