|
10/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 635, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3079.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2620.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1449.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|