LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB921
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB921
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB921
Compare Versions
AB921 Chaptered October 8, 2015
AB921 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB921 Amended September 4, 2015
AB921 Amended August 27, 2015
AB921 Amended August 20, 2015
AB921 Amended July 14, 2015
AB921 Amended June 24, 2015
AB921 Amended April 27, 2015
AB921 Amended April 20, 2015
AB921 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB921 Chaptered October 8, 2015
AB921 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB921 Amended September 4, 2015
AB921 Amended August 27, 2015
AB921 Amended August 20, 2015
AB921 Amended July 14, 2015
AB921 Amended June 24, 2015
AB921 Amended April 27, 2015
AB921 Amended April 20, 2015
AB921 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare