Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1812.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|