California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB932 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 07/15/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 932AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 15, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 28, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 8, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 26, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Daly and Thurmond FEBRUARY 26, 2015 An act to add Section 5165 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 932, as amended, Daly. Specialized license plates: professional sports. Existing law authorizes a state agency to apply to the Department of Motor Vehicles (DMV) to sponsor a specialized license plate program, and requires the DMV to issue those license plates if the agency receives 7,500 applications within a 12-month period, among other requirements. Existing law requires those license plates to have a design or contain a message that publicizes or promotes the state agency, or the official policy, mission, or work of the state agency. Existing law requires the DMV to charge certain additional fees for specialized license plates and deposit those fees in the Specialized License Plate Fund for allocation to the sponsoring agency, as specified. This bill would require the Department of Parks and Recreation to apply to the DMV to sponsor a license plate program for the issuance of license plates bearing the officially licensed logo, emblem, or trademark provided by a California professional sports franchise, upon entering into a memorandum of understanding with the franchise to participate in the program. The bill would  authorize the department to increase the additional fees for the issuance, renewal, or transfer of the specialized license plate for each specialized license plate program sponsored pursuant to these provisions, and would  require the revenue generated from the license  plates, as specified,   plates  to be  deposited in   deposited, as   specified, into  the California State Parks Account created by the bill in the Specialized License Plate Fund, for use, upon appropriation by the Legislature to the California State Parks Office of Grants and Local Services, for funding local parks and recreation grant  programs.   programs, and into the California Professional Sports Franchise Nonprofit Organization Account created by the bill in the Specialized License Plate Fund, for use, upon appropriation by the Legislature to the nonprofit organization identified in the memorandum of understanding, for funding charitable purposes of the nonprofit organization.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 5165 is added to the Vehicle Code, to read: 5165. (a) The Department of Parks and Recreation shall apply to the department, pursuant to Section 5156, to sponsor a professional sports franchise license plate program upon entering into a memorandum of understanding with a California professional sports franchise to participate in the program.  The memorandum of understanding shall identify the nonprofit organization associated with the professional sports franchise that may be receiving funds generated from the program.  The department shall issue specialized license plates for that program if the Department of Parks and Recreation complies with the requirements of Section 5156. (b) Notwithstanding Section 5154, the Department of Parks and Recreation shall accept and use the officially licensed logos, emblems, and trademarks provided by California professional sports franchises for the license plate.  (c)     (1)     The department may increase the fees prescribed in Section 5157 for each specialized license plate program sponsored pursuant to subdivision (a).   (2) (A) The California State Parks Account is hereby created in the Specialized License Plate Fund. The funds in the account shall be used, upon appropriation by the Legislature to the California State Parks Office of Grants and Local Services, for funding local parks and recreation grant programs.   (B) The California Professional Sports Franchise Nonprofit Organization Account is hereby created in the Specialized License Plate Fund. The State Treasurer shall create a subaccount within the California Professional Sports Franchise Nonprofit Organization Account for each California professional sports franchise participating in a specialized license plate program sponsored pursuant to subdivision (a). The funds in the account shall be used, upon appropriation by the Legislature to the nonprofit organization identified in the memorandum of understanding specified in subdivision (a), for funding charitable purposes of the nonprofit organization.   (c)   (3)  Notwithstanding subdivision (c) of Section 5157,  the total fee, which includes  the additional fees prescribed by Section 5157  and any increased amount  for the issuance, renewal, or transfer of the specialized license  plates   plates,  shall be  deposited, after the department deducts its administrative costs, in the California State Parks Account, which is hereby created in the Specialized License Plate Fund. The funds in the account shall be used, upon appropriation by the Legislature to the California State Parks Office of Grants and Local Services, for funding local parks and recreation grant programs.   distributed as follows:   (A) If the total fee is more than twice the amount of the additional fees prescribed by Section 5157, the total fee shall be distributed as follows:   (i) The department shall deduct its administrative costs.   (ii) Fifty percent of the total fee remaining after the department deducts its administrative costs shall be deposited into the California State Parks Account.   (iii) Fifty percent of the total fee remaining after the department deducts its administrative costs shall be deposited into the California Professional Sports Franchise Nonprofit Organization Account.   (B) If the total fee is twice the amount of the additional fees prescribed by Section 5157 or less, the total fee shall be distributed as follows:   (i) The department shall deduct its administrative costs.   (ii) The increased amount shall be deposited into the California Professional Sports Franchise Nonprofit Organization Account.   (iii) The remainder of the total fee shall be deposited into the California State Parks Account.   (C) If the department does not increase the additional fees prescribed by Section 5157, the additional fees shall be deposited, after the department deducts its administrative costs, into the California State Parks Account.