|
09/25/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 601, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 4. Page 6427.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6225.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 3. Page 5229.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Galgiani.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 14). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1850.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|