California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB935 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2016

Amended

Bill August 17, 2016
Bill September 4, 2015
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill June 23, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015