|
10/05/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 502, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/15/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2773.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2306.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1386.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|