California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB941 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 5, 2015

Amended

Bill August 26, 2015
Bill August 18, 2015