California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB951 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2015

Amended

Bill June 10, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015