LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB951
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB951
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB951
Compare Versions
AB951 Chaptered September 28, 2015
AB951 Enrolled September 3, 2015
AB951 Amended June 10, 2015
AB951 Amended April 20, 2015
AB951 Amended March 26, 2015
AB951 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB951 Chaptered September 28, 2015
AB951 Enrolled September 3, 2015
AB951 Amended June 10, 2015
AB951 Amended April 20, 2015
AB951 Amended March 26, 2015
AB951 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare