Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1921.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|