California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB954 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Amended

Bill July 6, 2015
Bill June 2, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill May 4, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015