California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB958 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2015

Amended

Bill June 29, 2015
Bill May 18, 2015
Bill May 4, 2015
Bill April 22, 2015