LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB958
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB958
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB958
Compare Versions
AB958 Chaptered September 21, 2015
AB958 Enrolled August 26, 2015
AB958 Amended June 29, 2015
AB958 Amended May 18, 2015
AB958 Amended May 4, 2015
AB958 Amended April 22, 2015
AB958 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB958 Chaptered September 21, 2015
AB958 Enrolled August 26, 2015
AB958 Amended June 29, 2015
AB958 Amended May 18, 2015
AB958 Amended May 4, 2015
AB958 Amended April 22, 2015
AB958 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare