California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB963 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2015

Amended

Bill August 31, 2015
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill July 1, 2015
Bill May 27, 2015
Bill March 24, 2015