LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB963
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB963
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB963
Compare Versions
AB963 Chaptered October 11, 2015
AB963 Enrolled September 8, 2015
AB963 Amended August 31, 2015
AB963 Amended July 16, 2015
AB963 Amended July 1, 2015
AB963 Amended May 27, 2015
AB963 Amended March 24, 2015
AB963 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB963 Chaptered October 11, 2015
AB963 Enrolled September 8, 2015
AB963 Amended August 31, 2015
AB963 Amended July 16, 2015
AB963 Amended July 1, 2015
AB963 Amended May 27, 2015
AB963 Amended March 24, 2015
AB963 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare