California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB964 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2015

Amended

Bill September 1, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015
Bill May 13, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill April 23, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015