LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB964
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB964
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB964
Compare Versions
AB964 Chaptered October 6, 2015
AB964 Enrolled September 10, 2015
AB964 Amended September 1, 2015
AB964 Amended May 28, 2015
AB964 Amended May 13, 2015
AB964 Amended May 5, 2015
AB964 Amended April 23, 2015
AB964 Amended March 26, 2015
AB964 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB964 Chaptered October 6, 2015
AB964 Enrolled September 10, 2015
AB964 Amended September 1, 2015
AB964 Amended May 28, 2015
AB964 Amended May 13, 2015
AB964 Amended May 5, 2015
AB964 Amended April 23, 2015
AB964 Amended March 26, 2015
AB964 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare