California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB970 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2015

Amended

Bill August 24, 2015
Bill July 14, 2015
Bill June 29, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015