LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB970
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB970
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB970
Compare Versions
AB970 Chaptered October 11, 2015
AB970 Enrolled September 4, 2015
AB970 Amended August 24, 2015
AB970 Amended July 14, 2015
AB970 Amended June 29, 2015
AB970 Amended April 15, 2015
AB970 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB970 Chaptered October 11, 2015
AB970 Enrolled September 4, 2015
AB970 Amended August 24, 2015
AB970 Amended July 14, 2015
AB970 Amended June 29, 2015
AB970 Amended April 15, 2015
AB970 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare