California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB990 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2015

Amended

Bill August 20, 2015
Bill July 15, 2015
Bill July 2, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015