LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB990
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB990
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB990
Compare Versions
AB990 Chaptered October 10, 2015
AB990 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB990 Amended August 20, 2015
AB990 Amended July 15, 2015
AB990 Amended July 2, 2015
AB990 Amended April 20, 2015
AB990 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB990 Chaptered October 10, 2015
AB990 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB990 Amended August 20, 2015
AB990 Amended July 15, 2015
AB990 Amended July 2, 2015
AB990 Amended April 20, 2015
AB990 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare