Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 53, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4958.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3905.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2016
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2016
|
Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 3572.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2016
|
Action rescinded whereby the resolution was adopted and to Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2016
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3510.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|