California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR104 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 06/01/2016

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 104CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 53 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JUNE 1, 2016 ADOPTED IN SENATE MAY 19, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 27, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 4, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 4, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 4, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Rodriguez (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Alejo, Travis Allen, Atkins, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonilla, Brough, Brown, Calderon, Campos, Chang, Chau, Chvez, Chiu, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Dahle, Dodd, Frazier, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gatto, Gipson, Gomez, Gonzalez, Harper, Roger Hernndez, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kim, Lackey, Linder, Lopez, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Medina, Mullin, Nazarian, Obernolte, O'Donnell, Olsen, Quirk, Rendon, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Waldron, Weber, and Wood) AUGUST 27, 2015 Relative to the Pomona Police Officer Shaun Diamond Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 104, Rodriguez. Pomona Police Officer Shaun Diamond Memorial Highway. This measure would designate the portion of Interstate 10 from the State Route 57 Interchange to the North Towne Avenue exit in the County of Los Angeles as the Pomona Police Officer Shaun Diamond Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, The dedicated men and women who have chosen law enforcement as a career face extraordinary risk and danger in preserving our freedom and security; and WHEREAS, On October 29, 2014, Officer Shaun Richard Diamond, age 45, of the Pomona Police Department succumbed to a gunshot wound he sustained the previous day while performing his sworn duty with the department's SWAT unit, and his untimely death in the pursuit of the highest ideals of public safety has brought immense sorrow and loss to the people of Pomona and throughout the State of California; and WHEREAS, A 16-year veteran of the law enforcement community, having worked for police departments in Los Angeles and Montebello prior to joining the Pomona Police Department (PPD) in 2006, Officer Diamond had a passion for working SWAT, and as a member of the PPD's SWAT unit for the past six years, he had served on dozens of SWAT operations and shared his expertise as a field training officer, in which capacity he was responsible for training new recruits; and WHEREAS, In his most recent assignment to the Pomona Downtown District Enforcement Team, Officer Diamond worked as a law enforcement liaison with the business community and the community at large, giving generously of his time to such local events and organizations as the Special Olympics and Tip-A-Cop. His community outreach efforts also included K-9 and SWAT demonstrations for local schoolchildren; and WHEREAS, Exemplifying the true character of the brave men and women who devote their time and energy to the perilous duties of law enforcement, Officer Diamond is remembered by his family, friends, and colleagues for his wonderful sense of humor, his contagious smile, and his unwavering commitment and dedication to duty, and for his efforts that made Pomona's streets safer, its neighborhoods stronger, and its residents more secure; and WHEREAS, Over the course of his distinguished career, Officer Diamond was renowned among his fellow officers for his love, honor, and dedication to his family, the uniform, and the law enforcement community, all of which were indelible and inseparable in his life. Officer Diamond leaves to his beloved children, Margo and Kelly Diamond, his devoted mother, Joy Diamond, and the countless individuals whose lives he touched, a legacy of commitment and service to others; and WHEREAS, Although we know that we can never repay the debt owed this valiant officer and his family, with this resolution, we pay tribute to his memory by standing with all law-abiding citizens in expressing our deepest appreciation for Officer Diamond's selfless dedication to preserving public safety; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby dedicates the portion of Interstate 10 from the State Route 57 Interchange to the North Towne Avenue exit in the County of Los Angeles as the Pomona Police Officer Shaun Diamond Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs, which shall include this special designation and the badge and patch of the Pomona Police Department, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.