Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 45, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3905.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2016
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2016
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3510.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3169.) From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|