BILL NUMBER: ACR 107CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 45 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE MAY 23, 2016 ADOPTED IN SENATE MAY 19, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 27, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Grove (Coauthor: Assembly Member Salas) (Coauthors: Senators Fuller and Vidak) SEPTEMBER 2, 2015 Relative to the Bakersfield Police Officer David J. Nelson Memorial Bridge. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 107, Grove. Bakersfield Police Officer David J. Nelson Memorial Bridge. This measure would designate the Hosking Road interchange over State Route 99 in the City of Bakersfield as the Bakersfield Police Officer David J. Nelson Memorial Bridge. The measure would request that the Department of Transportation determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this designation and, upon receipt of donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, On June 26, 2015, Officer David J. Nelson of the Bakersfield Police Department gave his life while performing his sworn duty to protect the citizens of the City of Bakersfield; and WHEREAS, Officer Nelson graduated from the Kern County Law Enforcement Training Academy on June 21, 2013, and served with distinction during his tenure as a City of Bakersfield police officer; and WHEREAS, Officer Nelson was chosen as a defensive tactics instructor for the Bakersfield Police Department in recognition of his advanced skill in officer safety techniques and, because of his commitment to excellence, was also selected to mentor and train police officer trainees; and WHEREAS, On June 26, 2015, Officer Nelson attempted to detain a dangerous and armed suspect who likely was planning to harm a citizen of Bakersfield. When the suspect failed to stop his vehicle as directed, Officer Nelson bravely gave chase and, during the pursuit of the suspect, Officer Nelson was killed in a fatal vehicle accident; and WHEREAS, Officer Nelson sacrificed his own life to save the lives of others; and WHEREAS, Officer Nelson demonstrated commitment, sacrifice, and courage that serves as a shining example of an exemplary law enforcement professional; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the Hosking Road interchange over State Route 99 in the City of Bakersfield as the Bakersfield Police Officer David J. Nelson Memorial Bridge; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receipt of donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.