Assembly | 03/10/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 11, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2016 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3815.). | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2016 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3132.) | ||
Senate | 02/24/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2016 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3381.) | ||
Assembly | 01/07/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 7). | ||
Assembly | 01/05/2016 | From printer. Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2016 | Introduced. To print. |