California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR110 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2016

Enrolled

Bill March 4, 2016

Chaptered

Bill March 10, 2016

Amended

Bill February 23, 2016
Bill January 11, 2016