Assembly | 08/16/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 117, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 08/16/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4879.) | ||
Senate | 08/03/2016 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). | ||
Senate | 06/15/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5276.) | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2016 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2016 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 3). | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2016 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/07/2016 | Introduced. To print. |