California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR112 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 16, 2016

Amended

Bill June 6, 2016
Bill May 5, 2016